Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |