Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023