|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-254
|
|
|
|
06/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|