Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023