Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|