Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023