Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2023