Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2023-316)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1121
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|