Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023