Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1215 (Ch. 2023-153)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1215
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|