Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023