Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 111 (Ch. 2023-231)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 111
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|