Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023