|
05/17/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-84
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (134165)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 134165 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (774144)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/30/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/22/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|