Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023