Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1281 (Ch. 2023-285)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1281
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|