Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2023