Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Filed |