Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023