Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1301 (Ch. 2023-301), CS/SB 1416 (Ch. 2023-315)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1301
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|