Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023