Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1297 (Ch. 2023-25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1297
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|