Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023