Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|