Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023