Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Now in Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Filed |