Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023