|
07/05/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-315, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1301 (Ch. 2023-301)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/26/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 102, NAYS 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/23/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|