Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1416 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023