Senate | 05/03/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1419 (Ch. 2023-238) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1419 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Filed |