Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023