|
05/18/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-94
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 82, NAYS 32
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 079711 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 826249 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 270127 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 110699 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 197071 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 192001 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment 962611 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 1423
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (533606, 534260)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|