Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023