|
06/22/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-267
|
|
|
|
06/20/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|