Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023