Senate | 05/01/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1595 (Ch. 2023-156), HB 1373 (Ch. 2023-306) | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1595 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | CS by Rules read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |