Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023