Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1517 (Ch. 2023-273)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1517
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|