Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023