|
05/08/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-31
|
|
|
|
05/05/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (714203)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 75, NAYS 34
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 231901 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 651419 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 714203 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (810840)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|