Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 7, 2023