Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1441 (Ch. 2023-72)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1441
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|