Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023