Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |