Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023