Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7027 (Ch. 2023-308)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted HB 7027
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/21/23, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|