Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2023

Prefiled

Bill February 13, 2023