Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7003 (Ch. 2023-74)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted HB 7003
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/21/23, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|