LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S7004
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S7004
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S7004
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 11, 2023
Analysis
April 10, 2023
Analysis
March 29, 2023
Analysis
March 28, 2023
Analysis
February 21, 2023
Analysis
February 20, 2023
Prefiled
Bill
February 13, 2023
Compare