Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Prefiled

Bill March 10, 2023